Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1657 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023