Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dempsey
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|