Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023