House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|