House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Remove Representative Marti as principal House author and substitute with Representative McDugle | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Marti | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |