House
|
05/01/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/01/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|