Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024