House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Rader, Howard, Gollihare, Weaver, Daniels, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
SCs removed Rader, Howard, Daniels, Bullard, Hall, Jech, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rader, Howard, Daniels, Bullard, Hall, Jech, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|