Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024
Bill February 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023