House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|