Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 25, 2023