House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Thompson (Kristen), Pugh, Seifried, Rader, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Harris
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) George, Stinson, Roberts, Miller, Duel
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|