Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill February 24, 2024