Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, May
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove Representative Conley as principal House author and substitute with Representative Schreiber
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Conley
|
|
|