Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1860 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024