House
|
05/26/2023
|
Pocket veto 06/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Rosino, Haste, Prieto, Pemberton, Hall, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|