LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1930
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB1930
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB1930
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 19, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 27, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 2, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 12, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare