House
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Daniels, Pugh, Pemberton, Seifried, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Special Conference Committee on HB 2775 and HB 1935
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator McCortney, Thompson (Roger), Hall, Coleman, Paxton, Rader, Seifried, Green, Newhouse, Stewart, Prieto, Murdock, Montgomery, Pederson, Dugger, Pemberton, Weaver, Stanley, Haste, Garvin, Stephens, Burns, Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Education Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Culver
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore, Baker, Luttrell, Caldwell (Chad), Maynard, Echols, McBride, Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|