Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Amended

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023