House
|
05/18/2023
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 63
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Remains on Fourth Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Burns; authored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|