Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023