Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Remove Representative Roberts as principal House author and substitute with Representative Davis | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Davis |