Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stewart
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), West (Kevin), Gann, McDugle, Grego, Smith, Patzkowsky, Ford, Maynard, Randleman, Pfeiffer, Olsen, Williams, Banning, Conley, Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|