House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Remove Representative Roberts as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|