Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023