Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |