Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Hefner | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Pae |