Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023