Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McDugle |