House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Roe
|
|
|