Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 22, 2023