Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 36 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Ford |