House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stewart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Thompson (Kristen), Pugh, Bergstrom, Green, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|