Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2180 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023