House
|
04/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/18/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|