Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024