Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Gollihare, Howard, Daniels, Jech, Weaver, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|