Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024
Bill February 20, 2023