Senate | 04/13/2023 | Failed in Committee - General Government | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |