Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023