House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|