Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |