Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023