House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|