Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023