House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|