House
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Vetoed 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|