House
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Sterling
|
|
|