House
|
03/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor 03/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Sterling
|
|
|