Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 20, 2024

Amended

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023